LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1342
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB1342
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB1342
Compare Versions
SB1342 Chaptered July 13, 2012
SB1342 Enrolled July 2, 2012
SB1342 Amended June 7, 2012
SB1342 Amended May 8, 2012
SB1342 Amended April 24, 2012
SB1342 Introduced February 24, 2012
Version 1 (Old)
SB1342 Chaptered July 13, 2012
SB1342 Enrolled July 2, 2012
SB1342 Amended June 7, 2012
SB1342 Amended May 8, 2012
SB1342 Amended April 24, 2012
SB1342 Introduced February 24, 2012
Version 2 (New)
Compare