California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1342 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2012

Enrolled

Bill July 2, 2012

Chaptered

Bill July 13, 2012

Amended

Bill June 7, 2012
Bill May 8, 2012
Bill April 24, 2012