|
10/09/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 698, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
10/09/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/16/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2011
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 22. Noes 14. Page 2441.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2011
|
From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 2261.)
|
|
|
|
08/30/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. (Ayes 3. Noes 0. Page 2123.) Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2011
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 54. Noes 25. Page 2638.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 17).
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/05/2011
|
Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 2177.)
|
|
|
|
07/01/2011
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on L. & E. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 1). Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2011
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2011
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1181.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 1013.) (May 16).
|
|
|
|
05/06/2011
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2. Page 885.) (May 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2011
|
Set for hearing May 4.
|
|
|
|
03/31/2011
|
Set for hearing April 27.
|
|
|
|
02/01/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 3.
|
|
|
|
01/31/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|