LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB136
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB136
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB136
Compare Versions
SB136 Chaptered October 9, 2011
SB136 Enrolled September 13, 2011
SB136 Amended August 22, 2011
SB136 Amended August 15, 2011
SB136 Amended June 22, 2011
SB136 Amended May 19, 2011
SB136 Amended April 28, 2011
SB136 Introduced January 31, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
SB136 Chaptered October 9, 2011
SB136 Enrolled September 13, 2011
SB136 Amended August 22, 2011
SB136 Amended August 15, 2011
SB136 Amended June 22, 2011
SB136 Amended May 19, 2011
SB136 Amended April 28, 2011
SB136 Introduced January 31, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare