California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB136 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 31, 2011

Enrolled

Bill September 13, 2011

Chaptered

Bill October 9, 2011

Amended

Bill August 22, 2011
Bill August 15, 2011
Bill June 22, 2011
Bill May 19, 2011
Bill April 28, 2011