|
09/21/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 420, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/21/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2012
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 1. Page 5011.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 69. Noes 5. Page 6443.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2012
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 6201.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 8).
|
|
|
|
06/28/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/11/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
|
06/07/2012
|
Referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 3. Page 3556.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/15/2012
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2012
|
Set for hearing May 14.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3211.) (April 17).
|
|
|
|
04/10/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2012
|
Set for hearing April 17.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
03/27/2012
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
03/26/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
|
03/08/2012
|
Referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2012
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|