California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1394 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2012

Enrolled

Bill September 5, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 21, 2012

Amended

Bill August 23, 2012
Bill June 11, 2012
Bill April 26, 2012
Bill April 10, 2012
Bill March 26, 2012