California 2011 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1394 Amended / Bill

Filed 03/26/2012

 BILL NUMBER: SB 1394AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE MARCH 26, 2012 INTRODUCED BY Senator Lowenthal FEBRUARY 24, 2012 An act to amend Section  57007   17926  of the Health and Safety Code, relating to  environmental protection   car   bon monoxide devices  . LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 1394, as amended, Lowenthal.  Environmental protection: reports.   Carbon monoxide devices.   Existing law requires an owner of a dwelling unit intended for human occupancy to install a carbon monoxide device in each existing dwelling, as specified. Existing law requires the installation of carbon monoxide devices in each existing single-family dwelling unit by July 1, 2011, and all other dwelling units by January 1, 2013. The State Housing Law creates standards for buildings used for human habitation. A violation of that law is a crime. Existing law requires an adopting agency or state agency that proposes new building standards to submit those standards for review by the California Building Standards Commission.   This bill would require the installation of carbon monoxide devices in all existing hotel and motel dwelling units by January 1, 2016. The bill would require the Department of Housing and Community Development to adopt building standards to implement those provisions by July 1, 2014. Because the violation of a building standard is a crime, the bill would impose a state-mandated local program.   The California Constitution requires the state to reimburse local agencies and school districts for certain costs mandated by the state. Statutory provisions establish procedures for making that reimbursement.   This bill would provide that no reimbursement is required by this act for a specified reason.   Existing law requires the California Environmental Protection Agency, and its boards, departments, and offices, to prepare and submit to the Governor and the Legislature various reports containing specified information on the implementation and effectiveness of certain programs, policies, and projects to ensure the protection of natural resources in the state. Existing law requires the agency, and each board, department, and office within the agency, to submit a biennial report to the Governor and Legislature, no later than December 1 with respect to the previous 2 fiscal years, reporting on the extent to which these state agencies have attained their performance objectives, and on their continuous quality improvement efforts.   This bill would eliminate the requirement for the submission of this biennial report to the Governor and the Legislature.  Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program:  no   yes  . THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS:  SECTION 1.   Section 17926 of the   Health and Safety Code   is amended to read:  17926. (a) An owner of a dwelling unit intended for human occupancy shall install a carbon monoxide device, approved and listed by the State Fire Marshal pursuant to Section 13263, in each existing dwelling unit having a fossil fuel burning heater or appliance, fireplace, or an attached garage, within the earliest applicable time period as follows: (1) For all existing single-family dwelling units intended for human occupancy on or before July 1, 2011.  (2) For all existing hotel and motel dwelling units intended for human occupancy on or before January 1, 2016.   (2)  (3)    For all other existing dwelling units intended for human occupancy on or before January 1, 2013. (b) With respect to the number and placement of carbon monoxide devices, an owner shall install the devices in a manner consistent with building standards applicable to new construction for the relevant type of occupancy or with the manufacturer's instructions, if it is technically feasible to do so. (c) (1) Notwithstanding Section 17995, and except as provided in paragraph (2), a violation of this section is an infraction punishable by a maximum fine of two hundred dollars ($200) for each offense. (2) Notwithstanding paragraph (1), a property owner shall receive a 30-day notice to correct. If an owner receiving notice fails to correct within that time period, the owner may be assessed the fine pursuant to paragraph (2). (d) No transfer of title shall be invalidated on the basis of a failure to comply with this section, and the exclusive remedy for the failure to comply with this section is an award of actual damages not to exceed one hundred dollars ($100), exclusive of any court costs and attorney's fees. This subdivision is not intended to affect any duties, rights, or remedies otherwise available at law. (e) A local ordinance requiring carbon monoxide devices may be enacted or amended if the ordinance is consistent with this chapter.  (f) On or before July 1, 2014, the department shall submit for adoption and approval pursuant to Chapter 4 (commencing with Section 18935) of Part 2.5, building standards for the installation of carbon monoxide detectors in hotel and motel dwelling units intended for human occupancy. In developing these standards, the department shall do both of the following:   (1) Convene and consult a stakeholder group that includes members with expertise in multifamily dwellings, lodging, maintenance, and construction.   (2) Review and consider the most current national codes and standards available related to the installation of carbon monoxide detection.   (g) For purposes of this section and Section 17926.1, "dwelling unit intended for human occupancy" has the same meaning as that term is defined in Section 13262.   SEC. 2.   No reimbursement is required by this act pursuant to Section 6 of Article XIII B of the California Constitution because the only costs that may be incurred by a local agency or school district will be incurred because this act creates a new crime or infraction, eliminates a crime or infraction, or changes the penalty for a crime or infraction, within the meaning of Section 17556 of the Government Code, or changes the definition of a crime within the meaning of Section 6 of Article XIII B of the California Constitution.   SECTION 1.   Section 57007 of the Health and Safety Code is amended to read: 57007. (a) The agency, and the offices, boards, and departments within the agency, shall institute quality government programs to achieve increased levels of environmental protection and the public's satisfaction through improving the quality, efficiency, and cost-effectiveness of the state programs that implement and enforce state and federal environmental protection statutes. These programs shall be designed to increase the level of environmental protection while expediting decisionmaking and producing cost savings. The secretary shall create an advisory group comprised of state and local government, business, environmental, and consumer representatives experienced in quality management to provide guidance in that effort. The secretary shall develop a model quality management program that local agencies charged with implementing air quality, water quality, toxics, solid waste, and hazardous waste laws and regulations may use at their discretion. (b) Nothing in this section abrogates any collective bargaining agreement or interferes with any established employee rights. (c) For purposes of this section, "quality government program" means all of the following: (1) A process for obtaining the views of employees, the regulated community, the public, environmental organizations, and governmental officials with regard to the performance, vision, and needs of the agency implementing the quality government program. (2) A process for developing measurable performance objectiveness using the views of the persons and organizations specified in paragraph (1). (3) Processes for continually improving quality and for training agency personnel, using the information obtained from implementing paragraphs (1) and (2).