LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1394
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB1394
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB1394
Compare Versions
SB1394 Chaptered September 21, 2012
SB1394 Enrolled September 5, 2012
SB1394 Amended August 23, 2012
SB1394 Amended June 11, 2012
SB1394 Amended April 26, 2012
SB1394 Amended April 10, 2012
SB1394 Amended March 26, 2012
SB1394 Introduced February 24, 2012
Version 1 (Old)
SB1394 Chaptered September 21, 2012
SB1394 Enrolled September 5, 2012
SB1394 Amended August 23, 2012
SB1394 Amended June 11, 2012
SB1394 Amended April 26, 2012
SB1394 Amended April 10, 2012
SB1394 Amended March 26, 2012
SB1394 Introduced February 24, 2012
Version 2 (New)
Compare