|
09/14/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 324, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/14/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 7:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 26. Noes 10. Page 4845.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2012
|
From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4792.)
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 4687.) Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
08/21/2012
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 51. Noes 26. Page 6015.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 8).
|
|
|
|
07/03/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/11/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
06/13/2011
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 13. Page 1261.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 2. Page 1113.) (May 26).
|
|
|
|
05/25/2011
|
Set for hearing May 26.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2011
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 853.) (May 2).
|
|
|
|
04/05/2011
|
Set for hearing May 2.
|
|
|
|
03/31/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
|
03/22/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/10/2011
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/01/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 3.
|
|
|
|
01/31/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|