LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB143
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB143
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB143
Compare Versions
SB143 Chaptered September 14, 2012
SB143 Enrolled August 30, 2012
SB143 Amended June 11, 2012
SB143 Amended May 10, 2011
SB143 Amended March 22, 2011
SB143 Introduced January 31, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
SB143 Chaptered September 14, 2012
SB143 Enrolled August 30, 2012
SB143 Amended June 11, 2012
SB143 Amended May 10, 2011
SB143 Amended March 22, 2011
SB143 Introduced January 31, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare