California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB143 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 31, 2011

Enrolled

Bill August 30, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 14, 2012

Amended

Bill June 11, 2012
Bill May 10, 2011
Bill March 22, 2011