|
08/30/2012
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6670.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 6455.) From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 28).
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2012
|
Read third time and amended. (Ayes 52. Noes 27. Page 6198.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 16).
|
|
|
|
08/08/2012
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/05/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/25/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2012
|
Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 6. Page 3740.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3565.) (May 21).
|
|
|
|
05/11/2012
|
Set for hearing May 21.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/01/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1. Page 3302.) (April 25).
|
|
|
|
04/13/2012
|
Set for hearing April 25.
|
|
|
|
04/09/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
03/22/2012
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2012
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|