BILL NUMBER: SB 1466CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 795 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE SEPTEMBER 29, 2012 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR SEPTEMBER 29, 2012 PASSED THE SENATE AUGUST 31, 2012 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY AUGUST 30, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY AUGUST 27, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY AUGUST 23, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY AUGUST 20, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JUNE 25, 2012 AMENDED IN SENATE MAY 25, 2012 AMENDED IN SENATE MAY 2, 2012 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 9, 2012 INTRODUCED BY Senator De Len FEBRUARY 24, 2012 An act to amend Section 830.31 of the Penal Code, relating to peace officers. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 1466, De Len. Peace officers: City of Los Angeles. Existing law provides that an officer of the Department of General Services of the City of Los Angeles is a peace officer if he or she is designated by the general manager of the department and his or her primary duty is the enforcement of the law in or about properties owned, operated, or administered by the department or when performing necessary duties with respect to patrons, employees, and properties of the department. A peace officer designated pursuant to those provisions and authorized to carry firearms by the department is required to complete an introductory course of firearm training and requalify for the use of firearms every 6 months. Existing law prohibits the peace officer from carrying a firearm when he or she is not on duty. This bill would, instead, provide that an officer of the Department of General Services of the City of Los Angeles who was transferred to the Los Angeles Police Department is a peace officer if he or she is designated by the Chief of Police of the Los Angeles Police Department, or his or her designee, and the peace officer's primary duty is the enforcement of the law in or about properties owned, operated, or administered by the City of Los Angeles or when performing necessary duties, as specified. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 830.31 of the Penal Code is amended to read: 830.31. The following persons are peace officers whose authority extends to any place in the state for the purpose of performing their primary duty or when making an arrest pursuant to Section 836 as to any public offense with respect to which there is immediate danger to person or property, or of the escape of the perpetrator of that offense, or pursuant to Section 8597 or 8598 of the Government Code. These peace officers may carry firearms only if authorized, and under the terms and conditions specified, by their employing agency. (a) A police officer of the County of Los Angeles, if the primary duty of the officer is the enforcement of the law in or about properties owned, operated, or administered by his or her employing agency or when performing necessary duties with respect to patrons, employees, and properties of his or her employing agency. (b) A person designated by a local agency as a park ranger and regularly employed and paid in that capacity, if the primary duty of the officer is the protection of park and other property of the agency and the preservation of the peace therein. (c) (1) A peace officer of the Department of General Services of the City of Los Angeles who was transferred to the Los Angeles Police Department and designated by the Chief of Police of the Los Angeles Police Department, or his or her designee, if the primary duty of the officer is the enforcement of the law in or about properties owned, operated, or administered by the City of Los Angeles or when performing necessary duties with respect to patrons, employees, and properties of the City of Los Angeles. For purposes of this section, "properties" means city offices, city buildings, facilities, parks, yards, and warehouses. (2) A peace officer designated pursuant to this subdivision, and authorized to carry firearms by the Los Angeles Police Department, shall satisfactorily complete the introductory course of firearm training required by Section 832 and shall requalify in the use of firearms every six months. (3) Notwithstanding any other provision of law, a peace officer designated pursuant to this subdivision who is authorized to carry a firearm by his or her employing agency while on duty shall not be authorized to carry a firearm when he or she is not on duty. (d) A housing authority patrol officer employed by the housing authority of a city, district, county, or city and county or employed by the police department of a city and county, if the primary duty of the officer is the enforcement of the law in or about properties owned, operated, or administered by his or her employing agency or when performing necessary duties with respect to patrons, employees, and properties of his or her employing agency.