LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1466
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB1466
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB1466
Compare Versions
SB1466 Chaptered September 29, 2012
SB1466 Enrolled September 10, 2012
SB1466 Amended August 27, 2012
SB1466 Amended August 23, 2012
SB1466 Amended August 20, 2012
SB1466 Amended June 25, 2012
SB1466 Amended May 25, 2012
SB1466 Amended May 2, 2012
SB1466 Amended April 9, 2012
SB1466 Introduced February 24, 2012
Version 1 (Old)
SB1466 Chaptered September 29, 2012
SB1466 Enrolled September 10, 2012
SB1466 Amended August 27, 2012
SB1466 Amended August 23, 2012
SB1466 Amended August 20, 2012
SB1466 Amended June 25, 2012
SB1466 Amended May 25, 2012
SB1466 Amended May 2, 2012
SB1466 Amended April 9, 2012
SB1466 Introduced February 24, 2012
Version 2 (New)
Compare