|
08/31/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 197, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2011
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 35. Noes 4. Page 1974.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 60. Noes 16. Page 2388.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (July 6).
|
|
|
|
06/20/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 14).
|
|
|
|
05/02/2011
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 6. Page 652.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
04/11/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
04/01/2011
|
Set for hearing April 11.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 415.) (March 22).
|
|
|
|
03/11/2011
|
Set for hearing March 22.
|
|
|
|
12/07/2010
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 6.
|
|
|
|
12/06/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|