LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB24
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB24
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB24
Compare Versions
SB24 Chaptered August 31, 2011
SB24 Enrolled August 19, 2011
SB24 Amended June 20, 2011
SB24 Amended March 29, 2011
SB24 Introduced December 6, 2010
Version 1 (Old)
SB24 Chaptered August 31, 2011
SB24 Enrolled August 19, 2011
SB24 Amended June 20, 2011
SB24 Amended March 29, 2011
SB24 Introduced December 6, 2010
Version 2 (New)
Compare