California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB24 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 6, 2010

Enrolled

Bill August 19, 2011

Chaptered

Bill August 31, 2011

Amended

Bill June 20, 2011
Bill March 29, 2011