|
09/01/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 2708.) From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (August 31).
|
|
|
|
08/30/2011
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 2688.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 17).
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 29).
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and H. & C.D.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 14. Page 1180.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 3. Page 1013.) (May 16).
|
|
|
|
05/06/2011
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3. Page 762.) (April 27).
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2011
|
Set for hearing April 27.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2011
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2011
|
Set for hearing April 6.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2011
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
02/11/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 13.
|
|
|
|
02/10/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|