California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB244 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 10, 2011

Enrolled

Bill September 13, 2011

Chaptered

Bill October 7, 2011

Amended

Bill September 8, 2011
Bill August 30, 2011
Bill August 15, 2011
Bill July 1, 2011
Bill June 23, 2011
Bill June 14, 2011
Bill May 18, 2011
Bill May 3, 2011
Bill April 25, 2011
Bill March 15, 2011