LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB244
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB244
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB244
Compare Versions
SB244 Chaptered October 7, 2011
SB244 Enrolled September 13, 2011
SB244 Amended September 8, 2011
SB244 Amended August 30, 2011
SB244 Amended August 15, 2011
SB244 Amended July 1, 2011
SB244 Amended June 23, 2011
SB244 Amended June 14, 2011
SB244 Amended May 18, 2011
SB244 Amended May 3, 2011
SB244 Amended April 25, 2011
SB244 Amended March 15, 2011
SB244 Introduced February 10, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
SB244 Chaptered October 7, 2011
SB244 Enrolled September 13, 2011
SB244 Amended September 8, 2011
SB244 Amended August 30, 2011
SB244 Amended August 15, 2011
SB244 Amended July 1, 2011
SB244 Amended June 23, 2011
SB244 Amended June 14, 2011
SB244 Amended May 18, 2011
SB244 Amended May 3, 2011
SB244 Amended April 25, 2011
SB244 Amended March 15, 2011
SB244 Introduced February 10, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare