|
09/21/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 419, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/21/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2012
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 31. Noes 0. Page 5107.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2012
|
Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 6737.) Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6738.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 6438.) From committee: Do pass as amended. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 28).
|
|
|
|
08/23/2012
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 6171.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/21/2012
|
Action rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, passed, and ordered to the Senate. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6032.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 8).
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/03/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/26/2012
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2012
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
01/26/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
01/26/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2715.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
01/18/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
01/17/2012
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
01/13/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 2623.) (January 10). Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Corrected January 23.)
|
|
|
|
01/04/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
02/15/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17.
|
|
|
|
02/14/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|