LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB323
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB323
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB323
Compare Versions
SB323 Chaptered September 21, 2012
SB323 Enrolled September 10, 2012
SB323 Amended August 29, 2012
SB323 Amended August 23, 2012
SB323 Amended August 14, 2012
SB323 Amended August 6, 2012
SB323 Amended January 13, 2012
SB323 Amended January 4, 2012
SB323 Introduced February 14, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
SB323 Chaptered September 21, 2012
SB323 Enrolled September 10, 2012
SB323 Amended August 29, 2012
SB323 Amended August 23, 2012
SB323 Amended August 14, 2012
SB323 Amended August 6, 2012
SB323 Amended January 13, 2012
SB323 Amended January 4, 2012
SB323 Introduced February 14, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare