California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB323 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 14, 2011

Enrolled

Bill September 10, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 21, 2012

Amended

Bill August 29, 2012
Bill August 23, 2012
Bill August 14, 2012
Bill August 6, 2012
Bill January 13, 2012
Bill January 4, 2012