|
10/09/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 703, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
10/09/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 9:45 a.m.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2011
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 2240.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2734.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2011
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2011
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 2632.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
In Assembly. Held at Desk. Action rescinded whereby the bill was read a third time, passed, and ordered to Senate. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2343.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (July 6).
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on P.E., R. & S.S.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
Referred to Com. on P.E., R. & S.S.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 979.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2011
|
Set for hearing May 9.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 809.) (May 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2011
|
Set for hearing May 2.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2011
|
Referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18.
|
|
|
|
02/15/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|