California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB349 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 15, 2011

Enrolled

Bill September 2, 2011

Chaptered

Bill October 9, 2011

Amended

Bill August 29, 2011
Bill May 26, 2011
Bill April 27, 2011