LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB349
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB349
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB349
Compare Versions
SB349 Chaptered October 9, 2011
SB349 Enrolled September 2, 2011
SB349 Amended August 29, 2011
SB349 Amended May 26, 2011
SB349 Amended April 27, 2011
SB349 Introduced February 15, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
SB349 Chaptered October 9, 2011
SB349 Enrolled September 2, 2011
SB349 Amended August 29, 2011
SB349 Amended May 26, 2011
SB349 Amended April 27, 2011
SB349 Introduced February 15, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare