|
10/03/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 447, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
10/03/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2011
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2268.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2011
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2773.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
07/05/2011
|
From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 22).
|
|
|
|
04/28/2011
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
04/11/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
04/11/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 596.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
04/06/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 493.) (March 30).
|
|
|
|
03/18/2011
|
Set for hearing March 30.
|
|
|
|
03/17/2011
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
03/09/2011
|
Set for hearing March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18.
|
|
|
|
02/15/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|