California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB381 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 15, 2011

Enrolled

Bill September 6, 2011

Chaptered

Bill October 3, 2011

Amended

Bill June 30, 2011
Bill April 6, 2011