LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB381
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB381
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB381
Compare Versions
SB381 Chaptered October 3, 2011
SB381 Enrolled September 6, 2011
SB381 Amended June 30, 2011
SB381 Amended April 6, 2011
SB381 Introduced February 15, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
SB381 Chaptered October 3, 2011
SB381 Enrolled September 6, 2011
SB381 Amended June 30, 2011
SB381 Amended April 6, 2011
SB381 Introduced February 15, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare