California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB386 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 15, 2011

Enrolled

Bill September 2, 2011

Amended

Bill June 30, 2011
Bill April 25, 2011
Bill March 25, 2011