LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB386
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB386
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB386
Compare Versions
SB386 Enrolled September 2, 2011
SB386 Amended June 30, 2011
SB386 Amended April 25, 2011
SB386 Amended March 25, 2011
SB386 Introduced February 15, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
SB386 Enrolled September 2, 2011
SB386 Amended June 30, 2011
SB386 Amended April 25, 2011
SB386 Amended March 25, 2011
SB386 Introduced February 15, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare