BILL NUMBER: SB 386ENROLLED BILL TEXT PASSED THE SENATE SEPTEMBER 1, 2011 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY AUGUST 25, 2011 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JUNE 30, 2011 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 25, 2011 AMENDED IN SENATE MARCH 25, 2011 INTRODUCED BY Senator Harman FEBRUARY 15, 2011 An act to add Section 5080.44 to the Public Resources Code, relating to state parks, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 386, Harman. State parks: proposed closures: public notice. (1) Existing law authorizes the Department of Parks and Recreation to enter into agreements between the department and federal and local governments and other public agencies for the care, maintenance, administration, and control of lands under the jurisdiction of any party to this agreement for the purpose of the state park system, as prescribed. This bill would require the department to post on its Internet Web site, at least 30 days prior to the date the department plans to close all, or a significant portion, of a unit of the state park system to public access, specified information about the proposed park closure, as defined, including information about how to contact the department in writing if an individual or other party is interested in entering into negotiations with the department for a contract or agreement to lease, operate, maintain, or provide concessions at a unit of the state park system that is proposed to be closed. The bill would require the department to respond in writing to any inquiry received in connection with the information provided pursuant to those provisions. (2) This bill would declare that it is to take effect immediately as an urgency statute. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 5080.44 is added to the Public Resources Code, to read: 5080.44. (a) The department shall post on its Internet Web site, at least 30 days prior to the date the department plans to close all or a significant portion of a unit of the state park system to public access, all of the following information: (1) The name of the park system unit proposed to be closed. (2) The approximate date of proposed closure. (3) Information about how to contact the department in writing if an individual or other party is interested in entering into negotiations with the department for a contract or agreement to lease, operate, maintain, or provide concessions at a unit of the park system that is proposed to be closed. (b) The department shall respond in writing to any inquiry received in connection with the information provided pursuant to subdivision (a). (c) For purposes of this section "closure" means any significant reduction in public access to all or a substantial portion of a state park unit. SEC. 2. This act is an urgency statute necessary for the immediate preservation of the public peace, health, or safety within the meaning of Article IV of the Constitution and shall go into immediate effect. The facts constituting the necessity are: In order that statutory changes are made to require the Department of Parks and Recreation to provide timely notice to the public on its Internet Web site of proposed closures of units of the state park system at the earliest possible time, it is necessary that this act take effect immediately.