|
09/30/2012
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2012
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 9:45 a.m.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2012
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 29. Noes 9. Page 5005.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 58. Noes 21. Page 6568.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 6250.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/05/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 3.) (July 3).
|
|
|
|
06/26/2012
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2011
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 7. Page 1263.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 2. Page 1116.) (May 26).
|
|
|
|
05/25/2011
|
Set for hearing May 26.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2011
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 4). Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2011
|
Set for hearing May 4.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
Re-referred to Coms. on HEALTH and RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2011
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|