California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB393 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2011

Enrolled

Bill September 5, 2012

Amended

Bill August 24, 2012
Bill June 15, 2012
Bill May 31, 2011