LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB393
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB393
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB393
Compare Versions
SB393 Enrolled September 5, 2012
SB393 Amended August 24, 2012
SB393 Amended June 15, 2012
SB393 Amended May 31, 2011
SB393 Introduced February 16, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
SB393 Enrolled September 5, 2012
SB393 Amended August 24, 2012
SB393 Amended June 15, 2012
SB393 Amended May 31, 2011
SB393 Introduced February 16, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare