|
08/28/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 209, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4466.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/08/2012
|
From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 4455.)
|
|
|
|
07/19/2012
|
Set for hearing August 8.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2012
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 4306.) Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
07/02/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2012
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5524.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/13/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 13).
|
|
|
|
06/07/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2011
|
Set, second hearing. Failed passage in committee. Reconsideration granted.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2011
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 4. Page 899.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 2. Page 762.) (April 27).
|
|
|
|
04/12/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
04/04/2011
|
Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
04/01/2011
|
Set for hearing April 27.
|
|
|
|
03/09/2011
|
Set for hearing April 6.
|
|
|
|
03/03/2011
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|