California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB475 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2011

Enrolled

Bill August 14, 2012

Chaptered

Bill August 28, 2012

Amended

Bill June 7, 2012
Bill May 22, 2012
Bill June 20, 2011
Bill June 6, 2011
Bill May 3, 2011
Bill April 12, 2011
Bill March 21, 2011