LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB475
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB475
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB475
Compare Versions
SB475 Chaptered August 28, 2012
SB475 Enrolled August 14, 2012
SB475 Amended June 7, 2012
SB475 Amended May 22, 2012
SB475 Amended June 20, 2011
SB475 Amended June 6, 2011
SB475 Amended May 3, 2011
SB475 Amended April 12, 2011
SB475 Amended March 21, 2011
SB475 Introduced February 17, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
SB475 Chaptered August 28, 2012
SB475 Enrolled August 14, 2012
SB475 Amended June 7, 2012
SB475 Amended May 22, 2012
SB475 Amended June 20, 2011
SB475 Amended June 6, 2011
SB475 Amended May 3, 2011
SB475 Amended April 12, 2011
SB475 Amended March 21, 2011
SB475 Introduced February 17, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare