|
09/30/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 831, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 9:45 a.m.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2012
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5015.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4988.)
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. (Ayes 3. Noes 0. Page 4858.) Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6190.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/21/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 16).
|
|
|
|
08/08/2012
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/26/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 19).
|
|
|
|
06/12/2012
|
Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
07/05/2011
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2011
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P.
|
|
|
|
06/13/2011
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 1. Page 1243.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 1014.) (May 16).
|
|
|
|
05/10/2011
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 848.) (May 2).
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2011
|
Set for hearing May 2.
|
|
|
|
04/11/2011
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
04/04/2011
|
Set for hearing April 25.
|
|
|
|
03/03/2011
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|