LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB542
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB542
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB542
Compare Versions
SB542 Chaptered September 30, 2012
SB542 Enrolled September 5, 2012
SB542 Amended August 20, 2012
SB542 Amended June 27, 2012
SB542 Amended May 30, 2012
SB542 Amended March 1, 2012
SB542 Amended June 20, 2011
SB542 Amended May 5, 2011
SB542 Amended April 14, 2011
SB542 Introduced February 17, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
SB542 Chaptered September 30, 2012
SB542 Enrolled September 5, 2012
SB542 Amended August 20, 2012
SB542 Amended June 27, 2012
SB542 Amended May 30, 2012
SB542 Amended March 1, 2012
SB542 Amended June 20, 2011
SB542 Amended May 5, 2011
SB542 Amended April 14, 2011
SB542 Introduced February 17, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare