California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB542 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2011

Enrolled

Bill September 5, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2012

Amended

Bill August 20, 2012
Bill June 27, 2012
Bill May 30, 2012
Bill March 1, 2012
Bill June 20, 2011
Bill May 5, 2011
Bill April 14, 2011