|
09/06/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 239, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2003.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2011
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2455.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 13).
|
|
|
|
06/29/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 905.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
Set for hearing May 2.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 643.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
03/09/2011
|
Set for hearing April 12.
|
|
|
|
03/03/2011
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|