California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB562 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2011

Enrolled

Bill August 24, 2011

Chaptered

Bill September 6, 2011

Amended

Bill June 20, 2011
Bill June 13, 2011
Bill March 29, 2011