LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB562
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB562
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB562
Compare Versions
SB562 Chaptered September 6, 2011
SB562 Enrolled August 24, 2011
SB562 Amended June 20, 2011
SB562 Amended June 13, 2011
SB562 Amended March 29, 2011
SB562 Introduced February 17, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
SB562 Chaptered September 6, 2011
SB562 Enrolled August 24, 2011
SB562 Amended June 20, 2011
SB562 Amended June 13, 2011
SB562 Amended March 29, 2011
SB562 Introduced February 17, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare