|
08/30/2012
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 58. Noes 10. Page 6667.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2012
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 6174.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 8).
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 5751.)
|
|
|
|
07/05/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 25).
|
|
|
|
06/18/2012
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
05/15/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on U. & C. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 7). Re-referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
|
03/22/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2011
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 14. Page 1216.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2011
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 3. Page 1086.) (May 23).
|
|
|
|
05/13/2011
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3. Page 885.) (May 4).
|
|
|
|
04/15/2011
|
Set for hearing May 4.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|