California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB594 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2011

Enrolled

Bill September 10, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 27, 2012

Amended

Bill August 23, 2012
Bill August 6, 2012
Bill May 15, 2012
Bill March 1, 2012
Bill May 25, 2011
Bill May 11, 2011
Bill April 28, 2011