LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB594
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB594
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB594
Compare Versions
SB594 Chaptered September 27, 2012
SB594 Enrolled September 10, 2012
SB594 Amended August 23, 2012
SB594 Amended August 6, 2012
SB594 Amended May 15, 2012
SB594 Amended March 1, 2012
SB594 Amended May 25, 2011
SB594 Amended May 11, 2011
SB594 Amended April 28, 2011
SB594 Introduced February 17, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
SB594 Chaptered September 27, 2012
SB594 Enrolled September 10, 2012
SB594 Amended August 23, 2012
SB594 Amended August 6, 2012
SB594 Amended May 15, 2012
SB594 Amended March 1, 2012
SB594 Amended May 25, 2011
SB594 Amended May 11, 2011
SB594 Amended April 28, 2011
SB594 Introduced February 17, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare