|
10/02/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 424, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
10/02/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 9:45 a.m.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2011
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2242.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2011
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 61. Noes 13. Page 2740.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2011
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 2639.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 17).
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/05/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (June 21).
|
|
|
|
06/14/2011
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/06/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 902.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. Set for hearing May 2.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 642.) (April 12).
|
|
|
|
04/01/2011
|
Set for hearing April 12.
|
|
|
|
03/24/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
03/21/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
03/03/2011
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|