California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB602 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2011

Enrolled

Bill September 2, 2011

Chaptered

Bill October 2, 2011

Amended

Bill August 29, 2011
Bill August 23, 2011
Bill August 15, 2011
Bill July 5, 2011
Bill June 6, 2011
Bill April 25, 2011
Bill March 30, 2011
Bill March 21, 2011